Home > 1st United Bank > History
1st United Bank, History
The following are major historical events for 1st United Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Faribault Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1985-02-28 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
1989-08-31 | Changed name to Faribault Federal Savings Bank | |
1989-08-31 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1996-12-02 | Changed name to 1st United Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2012-02-13 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2012-02-13 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2012-02-13 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS |