Home > Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB > History
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, History
The following are major historical events for Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, including mergers and acquisitions.
1832-02-18 | Institution established: Original name:Wilmington Savings Fund Society | |
1983-07-01 | Changed name to Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB | |
1987-02-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1987-08-10 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1995-11-17 | Acquired Fidelity Federal Savings and Loan Association (28792) in EXTON, PA | |
2010-12-04 | Acquired Christiana Bank & Trust Company (33875) in GREENVILLE, DE | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-09-05 | Acquired The First National Bank of Wyoming (4819) in WYOMING, DE | |
2015-10-09 | Acquired Greater Delaware Valley Savings Bank (29882) in BROOMALL, PA | |
2016-08-12 | Acquired Penn Liberty Bank (57844) in WAYNE, PA | |
2019-03-01 | Acquired Beneficial Bank (15697) in PHILADELPHIA, PA |