Home > West Shore Bank > History
West Shore Bank, History
The following are major historical events for West Shore Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1898-07-25 | Institution established: Original name:State Savings Bank of Scottville | |
1993-11-16 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
1997-05-05 | Changed name to West Shore Bank | |
2002-02-05 | Moved bank headquarters from SCOTTVILLE, MI to LUDINGTON, MI | |
2016-08-13 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS TERMINATED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2016-08-13 | Acquired West Michigan Bank & Trust (24471) in FRANKFORT, MI |