Wells Fargo Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Wells Fargo Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1870-01-01Institution established: Original name:Crocker First National Bank of San Francisco
1956-02-10Changed name to Crocker-Anglo National Bank
1963-11-01Changed name to Crocker-Citizens National Bank
1971-07-01Changed name to Crocker National Bank
1972-05-19Acquired The First National Bank of Upland (3536) in UPLAND, CA
1973-10-19Acquired United States National Bank (3506) in SAN DIEGO, CA
1973-12-31Acquired Imperial Valley National Bank (19518) in EL CENTRO, CA
1986-05-30Acquired Wells Fargo Bank, National Association (1230) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1986-05-30Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
1988-05-31Acquired Barclays Bank of California (19521) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
1989-07-31Acquired Bank of Paradise (23480) in PARADISE, CA
1990-01-01Acquired Valley National Bank, Glendale (17820) in GLENDALE, CA
1990-03-31Acquired American National Bank (19301) in BAKERSFIELD, CA
1990-04-01Acquired Torrey Pines Bank (22809) in SOLANA BEACH, CA
1991-01-01Acquired El Camino Bank (20176) in ANAHEIM, CA
1991-01-01Acquired Citizens Bank of Costa Mesa (20878) in COSTA MESA, CA
1996-04-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of California (1226) in LOS ANGELES, CA
1996-06-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Utah, National Association (1261) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
1996-06-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Oregon, National Association (2915) in PORTLAND, OR
1996-06-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Idaho, National Association (16549) in BOISE, ID
1996-06-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of Nevada, National Association (2278) in LAS VEGAS, NV
1996-06-01Acquired First Interstate Bank of New Mexico, National Association (16408) in SANTA FE, NM
1996-06-06Acquired First Interstate Bank of Washington, National Association (2981) in SEATTLE, WA
1996-09-01Acquired Wells Fargo Bank of Arizona, National Association (2843) in PHOENIX, AZ
1997-06-01Acquired Wells Fargo Bank (Colorado), National Association (3009) in DENVER, CO
2000-02-18Acquired Wells Fargo Bank (Arizona), National Association (34029) in PHOENIX, AZ
2000-07-08Acquired Norwest Bank Red Wing, National Association (5233) in RED WING, MN
2000-08-18Acquired North County Bank (21621) in ESCONDIDO, CA
2000-08-25Acquired Napa National Bank (23941) in NAPA, CA
2000-12-16Acquired First Security Bank of California, N.A. (23496) in WEST COVINA, CA
2003-11-21Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Wyoming, National Association (2210) in CASPER, WY
2003-11-21Acquired Wells Fargo Bank West, National Association (3011) in DENVER, CO
2003-11-21Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Texas, National Association (14533) in SAN ANTONIO, TX
2003-11-21Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Nebraska, National Association (5457) in OMAHA, NE
2003-11-21Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Montana, National Association (16309) in BILLINGS, MT
2003-11-21Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Alaska, National Association (16853) in ANCHORAGE, AK
2003-12-06Acquired Bank of Grand Junction (24500) in GRAND JUNCTION, CO
2004-02-20Moved bank headquarters from SAN FRANCISCO, CA to SIOUX FALLS, SD
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Michigan, National Association (5067) in MARQUETTE, MI
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Arizona, National Association (19501) in PHOENIX, AZ
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Wisconsin, National Association (18694) in MILWAUKEE, WI
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Indiana, National Association (13849) in FORT WAYNE, IN
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Ohio, National Association (778) in VAN WERT, OH
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Illinois, National Association (3667) in GALESBURG, IL
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank New Mexico, National Association (2252) in ALBUQUERQUE, NM
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank North Dakota, National Association (3922) in FARGO, ND
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota, National Association (15277) in SIOUX FALLS, SD
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Iowa, National Association (4448) in DES MOINES, IA
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, National Association (5208) in MINNEAPOLIS, MN
2004-02-20Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Nevada, National Association (27930) in LAS VEGAS, NV
2004-04-24Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank (30887) in OAK HARBOR, WA
2005-09-24Acquired First Community Bank, National Association (34049) in HOUSTON, TX
2006-06-17Acquired State Bank of Rogers (9335) in ROGERS, MN
2006-09-23Acquired Centennial Bank of Pueblo (22301) in PUEBLO, CO
2006-09-23Acquired Fremont National Bank of Canon City (3000) in CANON CITY, CO
2007-09-22Acquired Placer Sierra Bank (30307) in AUBURN, CA
2008-03-15Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association (27068) in PALO ALTO, CA
2008-10-18Acquired Shoshone First Bank (2214) in CODY, WY
2008-10-18Acquired First State Bank of Pinedale (18747) in PINEDALE, WY
2008-10-18Acquired The Jackson State Bank (520) in JACKSON, WY
2008-10-18Acquired Sheridan State Bank (25048) in SHERIDAN, WY
2009-01-01Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-Downtown, National Association (12863) in GRAND JUNCTION, CO
2009-01-01Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association (19109) in GRAND JUNCTION, CO
2009-02-02Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank (26983) in SIOUX FALLS, SD
2009-04-25Acquired Century Bank, National Association (3361) in TEXARKANA, TX
2009-11-01Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association (27076) in NORTH LAS VEGAS, NV
2009-11-07Acquired WACHOVIA BANK OF COLORADO, INTERIM NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (59019) in DENVER, CO
2010-03-20Acquired Wachovia Bank of Delaware, National Association (33931) in WILMINGTON, DE
2010-03-20Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association (33869) in CHARLOTTE, NC
2010-04-10Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association (58496) in ATLANTA, GA
2010-05-10Acquired Wells Fargo HSBC Trade Bank, National Association (34075) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA
2010-11-01Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association (57755) in ANCHORAGE, AK
2011-03-31Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank (26839) in CALABASAS, CA
2011-05-06Reorganized.
2011-07-01Reorganized.
2011-07-15Reorganized.
2011-12-01Reorganized.
2012-02-01Reorganized.