Home > Wayne Savings Community Bank > History
Wayne Savings Community Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Wayne Savings Community Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1899-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Wayne Savings and Loan Company | |
1993-06-23 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
1997-10-10 | Changed name to Wayne Savings Community Bank | |
2003-09-30 | Acquired Village Savings Bank, F.S.B. (34709) in NORTH CANTON, OH | |
2004-06-01 | Acquired Stebbins National Bank of Creston (17338) in CRESTON, OH | |
2011-01-11 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2013-01-03 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2017-09-09 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2017-09-09 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK |