Home > Wayne Bank > History
Wayne Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Wayne Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1871-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Wayne County Savings Bank | |
1962-01-22 | Changed name to Wayne County Bank and Trust Company | |
1963-03-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1963-03-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1993-11-01 | Changed name to Wayne Bank | |
2011-06-01 | Acquired North Penn Bank (31188) in SCRANTON, PA | |
2016-07-31 | Acquired The National Bank of Delaware County (7337) in WALTON, NY | |
2020-07-07 | Acquired USNY Bank (58541) in GENEVA, NY |