Home > USAA Federal Savings Bank > History
USAA Federal Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for USAA Federal Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1983-12-30 | Institution established: Original name:USAA Federal Savings Bank | |
1993-04-01 | Acquired USAA Financial Services Association (27255) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT | |
1993-04-01 | Acquired USAA Credit Card Bank (27562) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT | |
1994-12-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1995-04-19 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |