Home > Transpecos Banks, SSB > History
Transpecos Banks, SSB, History
The following are major historical events for Transpecos Banks, SSB, including mergers and acquisitions.
1924-03-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Security State Bank of Pecos, Texas | |
1943-12-06 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
1943-12-06 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2002-01-18 | Acquired Bank of Sierra Blanca (22002) in SIERRA BLANCA, TX as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2005-01-19 | Changed name to TransPecos Banks | |
2016-07-01 | Changed name to Transpecos Banks, SSB | |
2016-07-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2021-10-30 | Changed Bank Class to SI. | |
2021-10-30 | Changed Primary Federal Regulatory Agency from FDIC to FDIC. | |
2021-10-30 | Institution withdraws from membership in the Federal Reserve System. |