Home > THE VINTON COUNTY NATIONAL BANK > History
THE VINTON COUNTY NATIONAL BANK, History
The following are major historical events for THE VINTON COUNTY NATIONAL BANK, including mergers and acquisitions.
1867-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Vinton County National Bank of McArthur | |
2007-08-17 | Acquired The Salt Creek Valley Bank (13677) in LAURELVILLE, OH | |
2009-02-21 | Acquired The First Bremen Bank (9454) in BREMEN, OH | |
2012-10-03 | Changed name to THE VINTON COUNTY NATIONAL BANK | |
2012-10-03 | Moved bank headquarters from MCARTHUR, OH to MC ARTHUR, OH | |
2014-11-14 | Acquired The Citizens Bank of Ashville, Ohio (13223) in ASHVILLE, OH |