The First National Bank and Trust Co., Chickasha, Oklahoma, History
The following are major historical events for The First National Bank and Trust Co., Chickasha, Oklahoma, including mergers and acquisitions.
1892-08-21 | Institution established: Original name:The Citizens Farmers National Bank of Chickasha | |
1939-02-01 | Changed name to The First National Bank in Chickasha | |
1965-11-01 | Changed name to The First National Bank and Trust Co., Chickasha, Oklahoma | |
1994-09-30 | Acquired The First National Bank of Alex (4030) in ALEX, OK | |
1994-09-30 | Reorganized. | |
2001-07-01 | Acquired The First American Bank (4149) in MINCO, OK | |
2003-01-01 | Acquired Tri Star National Bank (26212) in BLANCHARD, OK | |
2007-03-01 | Acquired Cyril State Bank (18558) in CYRIL, OK |