Home > The Fidelity Deposit and Discount Bank > History
The Fidelity Deposit and Discount Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The Fidelity Deposit and Discount Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1903-05-11 | Institution established: Original name:The Fidelity Deposit and Discount Bank | |
1997-06-30 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2000-06-30 | Reorganized. | |
2020-05-01 | Acquired Merchants Bank of Bangor (7391) in BANGOR, PA | |
2021-07-01 | Acquired Landmark Community BankThe Fidelity Deposit and Discount Bank (57112) in PITTSTON, PA. |