Home > The Cape Cod Five Cents Savings Bank > History
The Cape Cod Five Cents Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for The Cape Cod Five Cents Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1855-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Cape Cod Five Cents Savings Bank (90207) | |
1972-10-31 | Acquired Wellfleet Savings Bank (90298) in WELLFLEET, MA | |
1981-01-02 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1981-01-02 | FDIC certificate number changed from (90207) to | |
1981-01-02 | Changed name to The Cape Cod Five Cents Savings Bank | |
2004-01-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2012-05-15 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2020-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from HARWICH PORT, MA to Hyannis, MA | |
2022-12-16 | Changed Bank Class to NM. | |
2022-12-16 | Changed Organization Type to TRUST COMPANY. |