Home > The Bank of New York Mellon > History
The Bank of New York Mellon, History
The following are major historical events for The Bank of New York Mellon, including mergers and acquisitions.
1851-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Irving Trust Company | |
1989-08-18 | Acquired Nanuet National Bank (7185) in NANUET, NY | |
1989-10-07 | Changed name to The Bank of New York | |
1989-10-07 | Acquired The Bank of New York (625) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1992-06-12 | Acquired Riverhead Savings Bank (16033) in RIVERHEAD, NY | |
1996-12-01 | Acquired The Bank of New York (6420) in WEST PATERSON, NJ | |
1996-12-01 | Acquired The Putnam Trust Company (9226) in GREENWICH, CT | |
2008-07-01 | Changed name to The Bank of New York Mellon | |
2008-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK CITY, NY to NEW YORK, NY | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired The Dreyfus Trust Company (26692) in UNIONDALE, NY | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired BNY MELLON INTERIM INSTITUTIONAL NATIONAL BANK (58926) in PITTSBURGH, PA | |
2008-07-01 | Acquired Mellon Securities Trust Company (26378) in NEW YORK CITY, NY |