Home > The Bank of Canton > History
The Bank of Canton, History
The following are major historical events for The Bank of Canton, including mergers and acquisitions.
1835-03-04 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Canton Institution for Savings | |
1985-10-11 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1989-06-26 | Changed name to The Canton Institution for Savings, The Bank of Canton | |
2004-03-22 | Reorganized. | |
2004-03-22 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2004-04-22 | Changed name to The Bank of Canton | |
2006-09-19 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED |