Home > Stifel Bank > History
Stifel Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Stifel Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2002-05-16 | Institution established: Original name:The Business Bank of Saint Louis | |
2018-09-01 | Changed name to Stifel Bank | |
2018-11-09 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2018-11-09 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2023-02-28 | Moved bank headquarters from 8000 Maryland Ave, CLAYTON, MO to 501 North Broadway, ST. LOUIS, MO. | |
2024-03-04 | Moved bank headquarters from 8000 Maryland Ave, CLAYTON, MO to 501 N Broadway, SAINT LOUIS, MO. |