Home > Stifel Bank and Trust > History
Stifel Bank and Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Stifel Bank and Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
2002-04-16 | Institution established: Original name:FirstService Bank | |
2007-04-02 | Changed name to Stifel Bank and Trust | |
2010-03-11 | Moved bank headquarters from SAINT LOUIS, MO to CREVE COEUR, MO | |
2013-09-06 | Moved bank headquarters from CREVE COEUR, MO to SAINT LOUIS, MO | |
2013-11-01 | Acquired Acacia Federal Savings Bank (32266) in FALLS CHURCH, VA | |
2014-11-03 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2014-11-03 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD |