Home > State Street Bank and Trust Company > History
State Street Bank and Trust Company, History
The following are major historical events for State Street Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.
1792-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:State Street Trust Company | |
1955-02-21 | Changed name to Second Bank-State Street Trust Company | |
1960-04-15 | Changed name to State Street Bank and Trust Company | |
2000-11-01 | Acquired Investors Fiduciary Trust Company (22529) in KANSAS CITY, MO | |
2007-07-02 | Acquired Investors Bank & Trust Company (20072) in BOSTON, MA | |
2023-05-06 | Moved bank headquarters from One Congress Street, BOSTON, MA to One Congress Street, BOSTON, MA. | |
2023-05-06 | Moved bank headquarters from One Congress Street, BOSTON, MA to One Congress Street, BOSTON, MA. | |
2023-05-06 | Moved bank headquarters from One Congress Street, BOSTON, MA to One Congress Street, BOSTON, MA. |