Star Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Star Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1904-08-15 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Bertha | |
1982-11-05 | Acquired The First National Bank of Verndale (5263) in VERNDALE, MN | |
1983-02-02 | Changed name to The First National Bank of Bertha-Verndale | |
2000-03-01 | Changed name to Star Bank, National Association | |
2000-03-01 | Acquired West Central Bank (10211) in BARRETT, MN | |
2004-10-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
2004-10-01 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2004-10-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2004-10-01 | Changed name to Star Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2013-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2013-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2013-07-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2013-10-15 | Moved bank headquarters from BERTHA, MN to MAPLE LAKE, MN |