SoFi Bank, History
The following are major historical events for SoFi Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1986-12-29 | Institution established: Original name:Foothill Community Bank, National Association | |
1993-08-01 | Changed name to Gold Country National Bank | |
2001-05-21 | Changed name to Gold Country Bank, National Association | |
2001-06-15 | Moved bank headquarters from BROWNSVILLE, CA to MARYSVILLE, CA | |
2012-01-02 | Changed name to Golden Pacific Bank, National Association | |
2014-05-02 | Moved bank headquarters from MARYSVILLE, CA to SACRAMENTO, CA |