Home > River Bank > History
River Bank, History
The following are major historical events for River Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1911-10-11 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Stoddard | |
1991-06-30 | Acquired Ferryville State Bank (14702) in FERRYVILLE, WI | |
1991-06-30 | Acquired De Soto State Bank (13572) in DE SOTO, WI | |
1991-07-12 | Changed name to River Bank | |
2005-10-01 | Acquired Farmers State Bank (13861) in BANGOR, WI | |
2020-01-01 | Acquired Union Bank of Sparta (5325) in SPARTA, WI |