Home > Republic Bank > History
Republic Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Republic Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1988-09-06 | Institution established: Original name:Republic Bank | |
1996-06-08 | Acquired First Executive Bank (27371) in PHILADELPHIA, PA | |
1996-06-08 | Changed name to First Republic Bank | |
2001-08-24 | Changed name to Republic First Bank | |
2003-12-05 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2003-12-05 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2010-09-08 | Changed name to Republic Bank |