RCB Bank, History
The following are major historical events for RCB Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1936-01-14 | Institution established: Original name:Rogers County Bank | |
1990-10-01 | Acquired Bank of Oklahoma, Claremore (10669) in CLAREMORE, OK | |
1990-10-01 | Changed name to RCB Bank | |
1993-11-12 | Acquired Liberty Bank of Owasso (23145) in OWASSO, OK | |
1994-01-03 | Acquired American Exchange Bank (427) in COLLINSVILLE, OK | |
1996-09-27 | Acquired American Bank of Pryor (16749) in PRYOR, OK | |
1998-05-19 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1998-07-10 | Acquired Bank of Inola (21339) in BROKEN ARROW, OK | |
2000-10-05 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2000-10-05 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2003-09-19 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2006-12-01 | Acquired Bank of Nichols Hills (34178) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
2007-02-12 | Acquired Pioneer Bank and Trust (4127) in PONCA CITY, OK | |
2010-07-09 | Acquired Home National Bank (11636) in BLACKWELL, OK as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-05-06 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2011-05-06 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-07-30 | Acquired Cornerbank (4803) in WINFIELD, KS | |
2019-04-01 | Acquired Central Bank and Trust Co. (11772) in HUTCHINSON, KS | |
2021-10-01 | Acquired Lakeside State BankRCB Bank (22217) in OOLOGAH, OK. |