Home > RBC Bank, (Georgia) > History
RBC Bank, (Georgia), History
The following are major historical events for RBC Bank, (Georgia), including mergers and acquisitions.
1985-08-30 | Institution established: Original name:First Bank of Baldwin County | |
1997-08-15 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1997-08-15 | Changed name to Citizens and People's Bank, National Association | |
1997-08-15 | Moved bank headquarters from ROBERTSDALE, AL to CANTONMENT, FL | |
1997-10-15 | Changed name to Citizens & Peoples Bank, National Association | |
1998-12-31 | Acquired Community Bank of Naples, National Association (34230) in NAPLES, FL | |
2002-09-27 | Moved bank headquarters from CANTONMENT, FL to PENSACOLA, FL | |
2005-03-18 | Changed name to First Gulf Bank, National Association | |
2005-03-18 | Acquired First Gulf Bank (27142) in GULF SHORES, AL | |
2009-08-27 | Changed name to RBC Bank, (Georgia) National Association | |
2009-08-27 | Moved bank headquarters from PENSACOLA, FL to ATLANTA, GA | |
2009-08-27 | Acquired Centura Card Bank (35466) in NORCROSS, GA |