Home > Profinium, Inc. > History
Profinium, Inc., History
The following are major historical events for Profinium, Inc., including mergers and acquisitions.
1916-05-12 | Institution established: Original name:Peoples State Bank of Truman, Incorporated | |
1999-04-22 | Changed name to Peoples State Bank of Truman, Inc. | |
2003-08-25 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2003-08-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2003-10-25 | Changed name to Profinium Financial, Inc. | |
2003-10-25 | Acquired The Martin County National Bank of Fairmont (5145) in FAIRMONT, MN | |
2004-12-02 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2013-07-15 | Changed name to Profinium, Inc. |