Home > Ponce Bank > History
Ponce Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Ponce Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1960-03-31 | Institution established: Original name:Ponce De Leon Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
1985-04-11 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1985-04-11 | Changed name to Ponce De Leon Federal Savings Bank | |
1997-03-01 | Changed name to Ponce De Leon Federal Bank | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2011-07-21 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2017-09-29 | Changed name to Ponce Bank | |
2017-09-29 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2017-09-29 | Reorganized. |