Home > Northview Bank > History
Northview Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Northview Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1908-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank of Finlayson | |
2004-02-14 | Acquired First State Bank of Floodwood (9742) in FLOODWOOD, MN | |
2004-04-01 | Changed name to Northview Bank | |
2006-12-03 | Acquired The First National Bank of Deer River (5122) in DEER RIVER, MN | |
2011-07-28 | Acquired First National Bank of the North (17195) in SANDSTONE, MN | |
2012-03-02 | Moved bank headquarters from FINLAYSON, MN to SANDSTONE, MN | |
2015-06-06 | Acquired State Bank of Park Rapids (1406) in PARK RAPIDS, MN |