Home > Northeast Bank > History
Northeast Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Northeast Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1872-02-05 | Institution established: Original name:Bethel Savings Bank | |
1984-02-15 | Changed name to Bethel Savings Bank FSB | |
1984-02-15 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
1987-08-13 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1996-07-01 | Changed name to Northeast Bank, F.S.B. | |
1996-07-01 | Acquired Brunswick Federal Savings, F.A. (29841) in BRUNSWICK, ME | |
1997-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from BETHEL, ME to AUBURN, ME | |
1997-10-24 | Acquired Cushnoc Bank and Trust Company (27533) in AUGUSTA, ME | |
2004-07-28 | Changed name to Northeast Bank | |
2004-07-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2004-07-28 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2004-08-30 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2004-08-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2004-08-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2005-09-21 | Moved bank headquarters from AUBURN, ME to LEWISTON, ME | |
2014-06-12 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2014-06-12 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2019-05-15 | Reorganized. | |
2020-03-02 | Moved bank headquarters from LEWISTON, ME to PORTLAND, ME |