Home > New Republic Bank > History
New Republic Bank, History
The following are major historical events for New Republic Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1998-12-15 | Institution established: Original name:New Republic Savings Bank | |
2005-03-16 | Moved bank headquarters from ROCKY MOUNT, NC to ROANOKE RAPIDS, NC | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2020-11-17 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2020-11-17 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2020-11-17 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2020-11-17 | Changed name to New Republic Bank | |
2021-04-01 | Moved bank headquarters from 521 E Morehead St, Charlotte, NC to 521 E Morehead St, Charlotte, NC. |