Home > MidFirst Bank > History
MidFirst Bank, History
The following are major historical events for MidFirst Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1911-02-28 | Institution established: Original name:Oklahoma National Bank of Chickasha | |
1962-02-10 | Changed name to Oklahoma National Bank & Trust Company of Chickasha | |
1997-06-26 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1997-06-26 | Changed name to Oklahoma Bank and Trust Company | |
1997-06-26 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
1997-09-12 | Acquired MidFirst Bank (17097) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
1997-09-12 | Changed name to MidFirst Bank | |
2000-11-15 | Moved bank headquarters from CHICKASHA, OK to OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
2009-08-14 | Acquired Community Bank of Arizona (57645) in PHOENIX, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2009-08-14 | Acquired Union Bank, National Association (34485) in GILBERT, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-04-30 | Reorganized. | |
2015-01-07 | Acquired Steele Street Bank & Trust (57575) in DENVER, CO | |
2016-07-01 | Acquired 1st Century Bank, National Association (57657) in LOS ANGELES, CA |