MCBank, History
The following are major historical events for MCBank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1908-11-24 | Institution established: Original name:The Trent State Bank | |
1952-02-14 | Changed name to Mills County State Bank | |
1986-12-08 | Reorganized. | |
2013-09-13 | Acquired The First National Bank of Hico (3253) in HICO, TX | |
2019-06-03 | Changed name to MCBank |