Home > Manasquan Bank > History
Manasquan Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Manasquan Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1874-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Manasquan Savings and Loan Association | |
1992-06-25 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1992-06-25 | Changed name to Manasquan Savings Bank | |
1997-10-15 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1997-10-15 | Reorganized. | |
2001-07-26 | Moved bank headquarters from WALL TOWNSHIP, NJ to MANASQUAN, NJ | |
2015-07-15 | Changed name to Manasquan Bank | |
2019-04-01 | Acquired Metuchen Savings Bank (30099) in METUCHEN, NJ |