Home > Macatawa Bank > History
Macatawa Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Macatawa Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1997-11-25 | Institution established: Original name:Macatawa Bank | |
1998-02-23 | Reorganized. | |
1998-10-30 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2003-01-01 | Acquired Grand Bank (27035) in GRAND RAPIDS, MI | |
2003-05-12 | Moved bank headquarters from ZEELAND, MI to HOLLAND, MI |