Home > Liberty Bank > History
Liberty Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Liberty Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1896-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Liberty Federal Savings and Loan Association | |
2001-03-01 | Changed name to Liberty Federal Savings Bank | |
2001-03-01 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2001-03-01 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2009-09-03 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-06-30 | Changed institution class to FDIC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANK | |
2014-06-30 | Changed name to Liberty Bank | |
2014-06-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2014-06-30 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2018-01-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN | |
2018-01-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATIONS |