Home > LendingClub Bank > History
LendingClub Bank, History
The following are major historical events for LendingClub Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1987-08-26 | Institution established: Original name:First Trade Union Savings Bank, FSB | |
1995-05-08 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1996-10-06 | Changed name to First Trade Union Bank | |
1998-11-24 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-09-18 | Changed name to Radius Bank | |
2021-02-01 | Changed name to LendingClub Bank, National Association. | |
2021-02-01 | Changed Bank Class to N. | |
2021-02-01 | Changed Organization Type to COMMERCIAL BANK. | |
2021-02-01 | Institution becomes member of the Federal Reserve System. |