Home > Landmark National Bank > History
Landmark National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Landmark National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1919-05-02 | Institution established: Original name:The Security State Bank, Auburn, Kansas | |
1992-02-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1995-06-21 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
1995-12-30 | Changed name to Auburn National Bank | |
1995-12-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1995-12-31 | Changed name to Security National Bank | |
1995-12-31 | Acquired Manhattan National Bank (29793) in MANHATTAN, KS | |
1995-12-31 | Moved bank headquarters from AUBURN, KS to MANHATTAN, KS | |
1997-12-31 | Acquired Citizens State Bank (1146) in OSAGE CITY, KS | |
2001-10-09 | Changed name to Landmark National Bank | |
2001-10-09 | Acquired Landmark Federal Savings Bank (28639) in DODGE CITY, KS | |
2004-04-01 | Acquired First Kansas Federal Savings Bank (27813) in OSAWATOMIE, KS | |
2006-01-01 | Acquired First Savings Bank, F.S.B. (32499) in MANHATTAN, KS | |
2012-04-01 | Acquired The Wellsville Bank (17923) in WELLSVILLE, KS | |
2013-11-01 | Acquired Citizens Bank, National Association (4667) in FORT SCOTT, KS |