Home > Inwood National Bank > History
Inwood National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Inwood National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1964-04-09 | Institution established: Original name:Inwood National Bank of Dallas | |
1989-02-24 | Changed name to Inwood National Bank | |
1989-02-24 | Acquired Centennial National Bank (25671) in RICHARDSON, TX | |
1995-03-03 | Acquired Turtle Creek National Bank (24663) in DALLAS, TX | |
1996-09-30 | Acquired United Bank & Trust, National Association (26231) in DALLAS, TX | |
1996-12-31 | Reorganized. | |
2000-05-12 | Acquired Provident Bank - Dallas (24501) in DALLAS, TX | |
2003-08-15 | Acquired Western Bank & Trust (33201) in DUNCANVILLE, TX |