Home > HSBC Bank USA > History
HSBC Bank USA, History
The following are major historical events for HSBC Bank USA, including mergers and acquisitions.
2004-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:HSBC Bank USA, National Association | |
2004-07-01 | Acquired HSBC Bank USA (589) in BUFFALO, NY | |
2004-07-01 | Acquired HSBC Bank & Trust Company Delaware, National Association (34867) in WILMINGTON, DE | |
2004-08-25 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW CASTLE, DE to WILMINGTON, DE | |
2005-03-01 | Acquired Bank of Bermuda (New York) Limited (32715) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
2008-12-20 | Acquired HSBC National Bank USA (58529) in BETHESDA, MD | |
2008-12-20 | Moved bank headquarters from WILMINGTON, DE to MCLEAN, VA | |
2018-02-09 | Moved bank headquarters from MCLEAN, VA to TYSONS, VA |