Home > Heritage Bank > History
Heritage Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Heritage Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1884-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Wood River | |
2000-04-29 | Changed name to Heritage Bank | |
2000-04-29 | Acquired First National Bank & Trust Company in Aurora (13943) in AURORA, NE | |
2000-04-29 | Acquired Stromsburg Bank (1162) in STROMSBURG, NE | |
2002-10-19 | Acquired Heritage Bank, National Association (57106) in DONIPHAN, NE | |
2003-05-31 | Acquired City National Bank and Trust Company, Hastings, Nebraska (13749) in HASTINGS, NE | |
2009-02-13 | Acquired Sherman County Bank (5431) in LOUP CITY, NE as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2013-11-30 | Acquired Peoples-Webster County Bank (14326) in RED CLOUD, NE |