Home > Hawthorn Bank > History
Hawthorn Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Hawthorn Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1911-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Farmers' Bank of Deepwater | |
1945-02-05 | Changed name to Farmers' Bank of Clinton | |
1979-12-13 | Changed name to Charter Bank of Clinton | |
1980-02-01 | Changed name to Charter Bank Clinton | |
1985-01-28 | Changed name to Boatmen's Bank of Clinton | |
1988-04-21 | Acquired Union State Bank of Clinton (13751) in CLINTON, MO | |
1988-04-21 | Changed name to Union State Bank of Clinton | |
1989-08-16 | Changed name to Union State Bank and Trust of Clinton | |
2000-05-04 | Acquired Citizens State Bank of Calhoun (12631) in CLINTON, MO | |
2000-05-05 | Changed name to CITIZENS UNION STATE BANK AND TRUST | |
2007-04-20 | Changed name to Hawthorn Bank | |
2007-10-06 | Moved bank headquarters from CLINTON, MO to JEFFERSON CITY, MO |