Home > Great Southern Bank > History
Great Southern Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Great Southern Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-03-02 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Quitman | |
1980-10-03 | Acquired First National Bank of Waynesboro (19622) in WAYNESBORO, MS | |
1981-06-24 | Changed name to Great Southern National Bank | |
1981-10-01 | Moved bank headquarters from QUITMAN, MS to JACKSON, MS | |
1981-10-01 | Acquired Bank of Jackson, N. A. (22966) in JACKSON, MS | |
1981-10-01 | Acquired Bank of Hattiesburg (22473) in HATTIESBURG, MS | |
1988-05-24 | Moved bank headquarters from JACKSON, MS to MERIDIAN, MS | |
2000-12-15 | Reorganized. | |
2015-04-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2015-04-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2015-04-01 | Changed name to Great Southern Bank |