GNBank, History
The following are major historical events for GNBank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1929-07-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Girard National Bank | |
1986-08-14 | Acquired The State Exchange Bank (8112) in YATES CENTER, KS | |
1995-01-03 | Acquired The Farmers State Bank (17400) in OFFERLE, KS | |
1995-01-03 | Acquired The Bucklin State Bank (14351) in BUCKLIN, KS | |
2002-02-01 | Acquired Kansas State Bank (15483) in HOLTON, KS | |
2006-09-01 | Acquired Valley State Bank (10412) in LAMAR, CO | |
2015-10-06 | Acquired University Bank (34985) in PITTSBURG, KS | |
2018-07-02 | Changed name to GNBank, National Association | |
2019-04-02 | Acquired The First National Bank of Girard (4672) in GIRARD, KS |