Home > Generations Bank > History
Generations Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Generations Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1907-10-08 | Institution established: Original name:Calhoun County Bank | |
2010-10-22 | Changed name to First Bank | |
2012-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
2014-02-03 | Acquired First Community Bank of Crawford County (35573) in VAN BUREN, AR | |
2016-04-04 | Changed name to Generations Bank | |
2019-03-21 | Moved bank headquarters from HAMPTON, AR to ROGERS, AR | |
2022-02-11 |