FNB Bank, History
The following are major historical events for FNB Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-08-23 | Institution established: Original name:State Savings Bank | |
1970-05-04 | Changed name to First National Bank | |
1970-05-04 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
1996-07-22 | Moved bank headquarters from FONTANELLE, IA to GREENFIELD, IA | |
2004-06-26 | Acquired Union National Bank (26246) in ANITA, IA | |
2016-07-01 | Changed name to FNB Bank | |
2016-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from GREENFIELD, IA to FONTANELLE, IA |