Home > First Western Bank & Trust > History
First Western Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for First Western Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1964-05-11 | Institution established: Original name:First Western State Bank of Minot | |
1966-03-29 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
1966-03-29 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1982-11-08 | Changed name to First Western Bank of Minot | |
1989-01-12 | Changed name to First Western Bank & Trust | |
2011-08-06 | Acquired First Western Bank & Trust (58254) in EDEN PRAIRIE, MN | |
2020-11-13 | Acquired BlackRidgeBANK (58580) in FARGO, ND | |
2023-12-01 | Acquired State Bank of LismoreFirst Western Bank & Trust (8190) in LISMORE, MN. |