Home > First National Bank of Oklahoma > History
First National Bank of Oklahoma, History
The following are major historical events for First National Bank of Oklahoma, including mergers and acquisitions.
1917-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank in Tonkawa | |
1985-04-04 | Acquired Bank of Hunter (2336) in HUNTER, OK | |
1987-04-16 | Changed name to First National Bank of Oklahoma | |
1993-10-14 | Acquired Leadership Bank, National Association (25167) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
1997-12-01 | Moved bank headquarters from TONKAWA, OK to PONCA CITY, OK | |
2011-04-30 | Moved bank headquarters from PONCA CITY, OK to OKLAHOMA CITY, OK |