Home > First Business Bank > History
First Business Bank, History
The following are major historical events for First Business Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1909-05-01 | Institution established: Original name:Kingston-Dalton State Bank | |
1990-03-09 | Changed name to First Business Bank of Madison | |
1990-04-02 | Moved bank headquarters from KINGSTON, WI to MADISON, WI | |
1996-03-07 | Changed name to First Business Bank | |
2001-10-03 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2017-06-01 | Acquired First Business Bank-Milwaukee (35445) in BROOKFIELD, WI | |
2017-06-01 | Acquired Alterra Bank (1149) in LEAWOOD, KS |