Home > Extraco Banks > History
Extraco Banks, History
The following are major historical events for Extraco Banks, including mergers and acquisitions.
1933-09-20 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank of Temple | |
1988-12-01 | Acquired Texana National Bank of Belton (25606) in BELTON, TX | |
1989-08-17 | Acquired Citizens National Bank of Killeen (23536) in KILLEEN, TX | |
1991-11-01 | Acquired First National Bank of Temple - South (24306) in TEMPLE, TX | |
1997-04-21 | Reorganized. | |
1999-03-29 | Changed name to Extraco Banks, National Association | |
1999-05-21 | Acquired Extraco Banks, National Association (25889) in WACO, TX | |
1999-06-28 | Acquired Bank of Troy (26611) in TROY, TX | |
1999-06-28 | Acquired Lorena State Bank (26494) in LORENA, TX | |
2000-03-31 | Acquired Guaranty Bank & Trust Company (1190) in GATESVILLE, TX | |
2002-12-03 | Acquired Heights State Bank (33218) in HARKER HEIGHTS, TX |