Home > Enterprise Bank & Trust > History
Enterprise Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Enterprise Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1988-05-09 | Institution established: Original name:Enterprise Bank | |
1998-10-08 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2001-09-29 | Acquired Enterprise Banking, National Association (4696) in OVERLAND PARK, KS | |
2004-01-22 | Changed name to Enterprise Bank & Trust | |
2006-10-07 | Acquired Enterprise Bank & Trust (35446) in NORTH KANSAS CITY, MO | |
2009-12-11 | Acquired Valley Capital Bank, National Association (58399) in MESA, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-01-07 | Acquired Legacy Bank (57820) in SCOTTSDALE, AZ as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-08-12 | Acquired The First National Bank of Olathe (4744) in OLATHE, KS as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2017-02-11 | Acquired Eagle Bank and Trust Company of Missouri (17691) in HILLSBORO, MO | |
2019-03-08 | Acquired Los Alamos National Bank (18799) in LOS ALAMOS, NM | |
2020-11-13 | Acquired Seacoast Commerce Bank (57428) in SAN DIEGO, CA | |
2021-07-21 | Moved bank headquarters from 150 NORTH MERAMEC, CLAYTON, MO to 150 North Meramec, Clayton, MO. | |
2021-07-21 | Acquired First Choice BankEnterprise Bank & Trust (57966) in CERRITOS, CA. |