Home > Dallas Capital Bank > History
Dallas Capital Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Dallas Capital Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1972-06-26 | Institution established: Original name:Town North National Bank | |
2002-06-20 | Changed name to Town North Bank, National Association | |
2012-08-20 | Moved bank headquarters from FARMERS BRANCH, TX to DALLAS, TX | |
2015-11-15 | Changed name to Dallas Capital Bank, National Association. | |
2016-06-27 | Changed name to Dallas Capital Bank, National Association |