Home > Dairy State Bank > History
Dairy State Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Dairy State Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1953-01-02 | Institution established: Original name:Dairy State Bank | |
1987-07-15 | Acquired Citizens State Bank (2466) in BIRCHWOOD, WI | |
1995-12-12 | Acquired First State Bank of Prairie Farm (10016) in PRAIRIE FARM, WI | |
2012-12-27 | Reorganized. | |
2014-02-22 | Acquired Bank of Turtle Lake (12786) in TURTLE LAKE, WI |